Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Colímon, S.M.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Port-de-Paix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1934 BornLes Gonaïves
11 Feb 196227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
18 Sep 197844.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
8 Dec 197844.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
22 Feb 198247.6SucceededBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
1 Mar 200873.6ResignedBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti

MicroData Summary for François Colímon:
Bishop François Colímon S.M.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Port-de-Paix

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port-de-Paix.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 1 Dec 2014