Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Willy Romélus

Bishop Emeritus of Jérémie, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1931 Born
13 Jul 195827.4Ordained PriestPriest of Les Cayes, Haïti
26 Apr 197746.2AppointedBishop of Jérémie, Haïti
26 Jun 197746.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jérémie, Haïti
6 Aug 200978.5RetiredBishop of Jérémie, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Joseph Willy Romélus
Bishop Joseph Willy Romélus (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Jérémie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArniquet

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jérémie.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast