Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Rizzi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Bulgaria

Titular Archbishop of Balneoregium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1926BornSan Giovanni in Persiceto, Italy
3 Oct 194822.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 199164.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Balneoregium
28 Feb 199164.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bulgaria
20 Apr 199165.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Balneoregium
199669.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Bulgaria
13 Apr 201286.1DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Mario Rizzi:
Archbishop Mario Rizzi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Bulgaria

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,400
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,444
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: CB, 14 Apr 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015