Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Dardani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Imola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1915BornGanzanigo di Medicina
18 Sep 193722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
28 Apr 196954.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
28 Apr 196954.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rebellum
25 May 196954.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rebellum
12 Mar 197459.0AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
19 Jul 198974.4RetiredBishop of Imola, Italy
18 Dec 199984.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Dardani:
Bishop Luigi Dardani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Imola

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015