Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Allorio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pavia

Titular Bishop of Formiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1891BornVillata
8 Apr 191625.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 194251.2AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
23 Aug 194251.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
2 Jul 196877.2RetiredBishop of Pavia, Italy
2 Jul 196877.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Formiae
9 Dec 196978.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Allorio:
Bishop Carlo Allorio (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pavia

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1969
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Sep 2014