Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Jules-François-Joseph d’Andigné de Mayneuf

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1756Born
20 May 178024.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181761.3SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
1 Oct 181761.4ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
17 Oct 181963.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
2 Feb 182265.7DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Jules-François-Joseph d’Andigné de Mayneuf
Bishop Louis-Jules-François-Joseph d’Andigné de Mayneuf (born , died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Lion-d'Angers

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast