Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Marie-Clauce de Bruc-Montplaisir

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1751BornVallet
1 Jun 177624.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 181766.3SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
23 Aug 181968.1ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
17 Oct 181968.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
11 Nov 181968.3InstalledBishop of Vannes, France
8 Jun 182674.9DiedBishop of Vannes, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Marie-Clauce de Bruc-Montplaisir:
Bishop Henri-Marie-Clauce de Bruc-Montplaisir (born , died ) Bishop of Vannes

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013