Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Claudel, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Antandrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1876Born
8 Sep 189620.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
4 Aug 190125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Jul 194367.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia
14 Jul 194367.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Antandrus
12 Sep 194367.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antandrus
12 Dec 195579.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Claudel
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Claudel C.SS.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Reyes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColroy-La-Roche, France

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast