Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Abel Isidoro Antezana y Rojas, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of La Paz, Bolivia

Titular Archbishop of Sinna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1886Born
31 May 190923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
19 May 192438.0AppointedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
13 Nov 192438.5AppointedBishop of Oruro, Bolivia
15 Mar 192538.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oruro, Bolivia
16 Jan 193851.6AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
18 Jun 194357.0AppointedArchbishop of La Paz, Bolivia
5 Apr 196780.8RetiredArchbishop of La Paz, Bolivia
5 Apr 196780.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sinna
27 Nov 196882.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Abel Isidoro Antezana y Rojas
Archbishop Abel Isidoro Antezana y Rojas C.M.F. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarata

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • r: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 59, Page 521
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,925, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast