Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Ferrari

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mantova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1910BornFresonara
29 Jun 193525.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 195241.9AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
15 Jun 195242.1Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
19 Oct 196757.4AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
28 Jun 198676.1RetiredBishop of Mantova, Italy
1 Dec 199282.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Ferrari:
Bishop Carlo Ferrari (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mantova

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015