Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Scapecchi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy

Titular Bishop of Vicohabentia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1910Born
1 Apr 193322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cortona, Italy
11 Jul 196756.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cortona, Italy
11 Jul 196756.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicohabentia
8 Oct 196757.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicohabentia
30 Sep 198676.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy
25 Jul 198776.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy
30 Mar 199685.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Scapecchi
Bishop Angelo Scapecchi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte S. Savino

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast