Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Giovannetti

Bishop Emeritus of Fiesole, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1934 Born
15 Jun 195722.8Ordained PriestPriest of Arezzo, Italy
15 Feb 197843.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arezzo, Italy
15 Feb 197843.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaba
8 Apr 197843.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaba
27 May 198146.8AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
6 Jul 198146.9InstalledBishop of Fiesole, Italy
13 Feb 201075.5RetiredBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luciano Giovannetti
Bishop Luciano Giovannetti (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Fiesole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCivitella in Val di Chiana
Ordained BishopS. Donat, Cathedral, Arezzo, Diocese of Arezzo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fiesole.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,677

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast