Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Franciolini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1891BornSassoferrato
3 Mar 191725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Nocera Umbra, Italy
2 Mar 193240.2AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
1 May 193240.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
1950²58.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Arezzo, Italy
1956²64.0ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Arezzo, Italy
15 Feb 197886.1RetiredBishop of Cortona, Italy
16 Apr 198997.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Cortona, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Franciolini:
Bishop Giuseppe Franciolini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cortona

  • a priest for 72.1 years
  • a bishop for 56.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015