Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Cibotti

Bishop of Isernia-Venafro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1954 BornCasalbordino
1 Jul 197823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chieti, Italy
8 May 201459.5AppointedBishop of Isernia-Venafro, Italy
11 Jun 201459.6Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia-Venafro, Italy
28 Jun 201459.7InstalledBishop of Isernia-Venafro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Cibotti:
Bishop Camillo Cibotti (born ) Bishop of Isernia-Venafro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Isernia-Venafro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 May 2014