Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vincenzo Cardinal Fagiolo

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts

Cardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1918BornSegni
6 Mar 194325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
20 Nov 197153.7AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
19 Dec 197153.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
8 Apr 198466.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Religious and Secular Institutes
15 Jul 198466.4ResignedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
15 Dec 199072.8AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts
26 Nov 199476.8Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199476.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro
19 Dec 199476.8RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts
22 Sep 200082.6DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Fagiolo:
Vincenzo Cardinal Fagiolo (born , died ) President Emeritus of Interpretation of Legislative Texts

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
  • a cardinal for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014