Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Job Chen Qiming (Chen Chi-ming, Chen Ki-meng), C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1891Born
191119.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
6 Jan 191624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
5 Jan 193947.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chengting [Zhengding], China
5 Jan 193947.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Perta
21 May 193947.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Perta
11 Apr 194654.4AppointedBishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China
10 Jun 195967.5DiedBishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China

MicroData Summary for Job Chen Qiming (Chen Chi-ming, Chen Ki-meng)
Bishop Job Chen Qiming (Chen Chi-ming, Chen Ki-meng) C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Zhengding [Chengting]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWangkiachwang
Ordained BishopTientsien
Death PlaceSão Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo, Brazil

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1939, Number 27
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast