Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Kuo Joshih, C.D.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Taipei

Titular Archbishop of Salamis

Note/Previous Titular See: (Congr. dei Discepoli del Signore)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1906BornKaojen
28 Dec 193125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Other
13 Jun 195044.3AppointedPrefect of Taipei, Taiwan
7 Aug 195246.5AppointedArchbishop of Taipei, Taiwan
26 Oct 195246.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Taipei, Taiwan
4 Dec 195953.8ResignedArchbishop of Taipei, Taiwan
4 Dec 195953.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Salamis
18 Dec 199589.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Taipei, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kuo Joshih:
Archbishop Joseph Kuo Joshih C.D.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Taipei

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1952, Number 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013