Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Vienne de Hautefeuille, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tianjin [Tientsin]

Titular Bishop of Abora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1877BornDouai, France
2 Jul 189922.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
9 Jun 190023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
10 Aug 191538.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China
10 Aug 191538.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Abrittum
21 Nov 191538.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abrittum
4 Feb 191739.8SucceededVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China
2 Apr 191942.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China
22 Jul 192043.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Coastal Chi-Li {Ce-Li Marittimo}, China
12 Jun 192346.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Coastal Chi-Li {Ce-Li Marittimo}, China
11 Apr 194669.0AppointedBishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China
14 Jun 195174.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abora
14 Jun 195174.2RetiredBishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China
21 Sep 195780.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Tianjin [Tientsin], China

MicroData Summary for Jean de Vienne de Hautefeuille:
Bishop Jean de Vienne de Hautefeuille C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tianjin [Tientsin]

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 34
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014