Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop JosÚ Chittooparambil, C.M.I.

Bishop of Rajkot (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1954 BornNeeleswaram presso Ernakulam
5 Jun 197722.4ProfessedMember of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
8 May 198530.4Ordained PriestPriest of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
16 Jul 201055.5AppointedBishop of Rajkot (Syro-Malabarese), India
11 Sep 201055.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rajkot (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for JosÚ Chittooparambil:
Bishop JosÚ Chittooparambil C.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Rajkot

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rajkot (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,787

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015