Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis Henri Marie Ferrand

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tours, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1906Born
1 Sep 192923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tours, France
11 Jan 195448.0AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
24 Feb 195448.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
17 Apr 195650.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Tours, France
17 Apr 195650.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
28 Oct 195650.8SucceededArchbishop of Tours, France
9 Sep 198074.6RetiredArchbishop of Tours, France
9 May 200397.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Henri Marie Ferrand
Archbishop Louis Henri Marie Ferrand (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tours

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoches

  • a priest for 73.6 years
  • a bishop for 49.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast