Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Auguste-Marie-Joseph Douillard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France

Titular Bishop of Berrhoea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1888Born
17 Dec 191022.6Ordained PriestPriest of Angers, France
17 Feb 194758.8AppointedBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
1 May 194759.0Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
22 May 196375.0RetiredBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
22 May 196375.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Berrhoea
20 Aug 196375.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Auguste-Marie-Joseph Douillard
Bishop Pierre-Auguste-Marie-Joseph Douillard (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuiset-Doré

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jul 2018

Quantcast