Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frédéric Duc

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1883BornMontgilbert
11 Jul 190925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
30 May 194460.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
30 May 194460.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
25 Jul 194460.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
14 Mar 194662.5SucceededBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
11 Jan 195470.4ResignedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
11 Jan 195470.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
10 Dec 197087.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Lydda
24 Jun 197591.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

MicroData Summary for Frédéric Duc:
Bishop Frédéric Duc (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013