Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Audilio Aguilar Aguilar

Bishop of Santiago de Veraguas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1963 BornCañazas
4 Aug 199027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Veraguas, Panama
18 Jun 200541.9AppointedBishop of Colón-Kuna Yala, Panama
6 Aug 200542.0Ordained BishopBishop of Colón-Kuna Yala, Panama
30 Apr 201349.7AppointedBishop of Santiago de Veraguas, Panama
30 Jun 201349.9InstalledBishop of Santiago de Veraguas, Panama

MicroData Summary for Audilio Aguilar Aguilar:
Bishop Audilio Aguilar Aguilar (born ) Bishop of Santiago de Veraguas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santiago de Veraguas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,960
  • ab: CB, 30 Apr 2013
  • i: CB, 30 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Sep 2014