Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Eugène Gabriel David, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Majunga, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1912Born
3 Jul 193825.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
29 Sep 193826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
21 Feb 195441.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
22 Feb 195441.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Majunga, Madagascar
1 Jul 195441.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
14 Sep 195543.1AppointedBishop of Majunga, Madagascar
27 Apr 197865.7ResignedBishop of Majunga, Madagascar
3 Jul 199582.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Majunga, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Jean Eugène Gabriel David
Bishop Jean Eugène Gabriel David C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Majunga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCholet, Diocese of Angers, France
Ordained DeaconSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Church, Cholet, Diocese of Angers, France
Death PlaceAngers, Diocese of Angers, France

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • od/op/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018
  • od/op/c01/loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast