Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Rossi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Biella, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1890Born
21 Sep 191222.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 193646.7AppointedBishop of Biella, Italy
31 Jan 193746.9Ordained BishopBishop of Biella, Italy
15 Feb 197281.9RetiredBishop of Biella, Italy
29 Feb 198089.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Biella, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Rossi
Bishop Carlo Rossi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Biella

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast