Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Bianco

Apostolic Nuncio to Uganda

Titular Archbishop of Falerone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1960 Born
30 Mar 198525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Casale Monferrato, Italy
12 Jan 200948.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Falerone
12 Jan 200948.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
25 Apr 200949.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Falerone
12 Jul 201454.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ethiopia
10 Sep 201454.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Djibouti
10 Sep 201454.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Somalia
4 Feb 201958.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uganda

MicroData Summary for Luigi Bianco
Archbishop Luigi Bianco (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Uganda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontemagno, Italy
Ordained BishopSant’Evasio, Cathedral, Casale Monferrato, Diocese of Casale Monferrato, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Uganda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,159
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Sep 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 7 Jul 2019

Quantcast