Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Michael Sullivan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York

Titular Bishop of Suliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1930BornBrooklyn
2 Jun 195626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
4 Oct 198050.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
4 Oct 198050.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Suliana
24 Nov 198050.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suliana
12 May 200575.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
7 Jun 201383.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Michael Sullivan:
Bishop Joseph Michael Sullivan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 7 Jun 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015