Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René Arnold Valero

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Vicus Turris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1930Born
2 Jun 195625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
4 Oct 198050.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
4 Oct 198050.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Turris
24 Nov 198050.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Turris
27 Oct 200575.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
10 Mar 201988.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for René Arnold Valero
Bishop René Arnold Valero (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManhattan
Death PlaceLong Island Jewish Medical Center
Buried Place (Original)Bishops Crypt, Immaculate Conception Center, Douglaston, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Mar 2019

Quantcast