Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonard Philip Cowley

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

Titular Bishop of Pertusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1913Born
4 Jun 193825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
28 Nov 195744.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
28 Nov 195744.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pertusa
29 Jan 195844.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pertusa
18 Aug 197360.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Leonard Philip Cowley
(WikiData: Q6525633)
Bishop Leonard Philip Cowley (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Paul, MN, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Ordained PriestSt. Paul, MN, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Ordained BishopSaint Paul, Cathedral, St. Paul, MN, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Death PlaceMinneapolis, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1958, Number 5
  • c1: CB, 19 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024