Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Eugene Walsh

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yakima, Washington, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1916Born
6 Jun 194225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
5 Sep 197457.8AppointedBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
28 Oct 197458.0Ordained BishopBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
10 Aug 197659.8ResignedBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
10 Aug 197659.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
10 Aug 197659.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Volsinium
6 Sep 198366.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
6 Sep 198366.9RetiredTitular Bishop of Volsinium
21 Apr 199780.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Yakima, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Eugene Walsh
Bishop Nicolas Eugene Walsh (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yakima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurnsville

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast