Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Schenk

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Duluth, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1901Born
13 Jun 192625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
10 Mar 194543.9AppointedBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
24 May 194544.1Ordained BishopBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
19 Jan 196058.7AppointedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
30 Apr 196968.0RetiredBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
28 Oct 196968.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Duluth, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Schenk
Bishop Francis Joseph Schenk (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Duluth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSuperior

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1945, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018