Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Nepomucenus Zobl

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Evaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1822Born
25 Jul 184523.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
27 Jul 184523.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
27 Mar 188563.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
27 Mar 188563.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
26 Apr 188563.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Evaria
13 Sep 190785.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Johann Nepomucenus Zobl (VIAF: 81345354)
Bishop Johann Nepomucenus Zobl (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchattwald, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}
Ordained BishopBrixen, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1885, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017