Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Hubert Peschges

Deceased

Bishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1881Born
15 Apr 190523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Winona, Minnesota, USA
30 Aug 193857.3AppointedBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
9 Nov 193857.4Ordained BishopBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
30 Oct 194463.4DiedBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for John Hubert Peschges
Bishop John Hubert Peschges (born , died ) Bishop of Crookston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWest Newton, MN

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast