Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Jerome Ferdinand Weber, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1915BornMuenster
8 Jun 194125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Apr 196044.5SelectedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada
28 Jun 196044.7ConfirmedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada
15 Jun 199074.7RetiredAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada
4 Sep 200892.9DiedAbbot Emeritus of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jerome Ferdinand Weber:
Abbot Jerome Ferdinand Weber O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Saint Peter-Muenster

  • a priest for 67.2 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015