Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Kavanagh

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin

Titular Bishop of Zerta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1914BornDublin
18 Jun 193925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
6 Mar 197358.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
6 Mar 197358.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zerta
8 Apr 197358.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zerta
31 Dec 199076.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
8 Aug 200288.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Kavanagh:
Bishop James Kavanagh (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013