Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Derek John Christopher Byrne, S.P.S.

Bishop of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1948 BornDublin, Ireland
1 Oct 196921.7ProfessedMember of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
9 Jun 197325.4Ordained PriestPriest of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
24 Dec 200860.9AppointedBishop of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil
22 Mar 200961.2Ordained BishopBishop of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Derek John Christopher Byrne:
Bishop Derek John Christopher Byrne S.P.S. (born ) Bishop of Guiratinga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guiratinga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,073

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013