Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Edward ("Ned") Shlesinger III

Auxiliary Bishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA

Titular Bishop of Naiera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1960 Born
22 Jun 199635.5Ordained PriestPriest of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
15 May 201756.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
15 May 201756.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Naiera
19 Jul 201756.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naiera

MicroData Summary for Bernard Edward ("Ned") Shlesinger III
Bishop Bernard Edward ("Ned") Shlesinger III (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Atlanta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWashington, D.C., Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Atlanta, Archdiocese of Atlanta, Georgia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Atlanta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 May 2017
  • mn: CB, 15 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 25 May 2017
  • c2+: CB, 8 Jul 2017
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jul 2017