Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Francis Anderson

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Duluth, Minnesota

Auxiliary Bishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1917BornRoslindale, MA
6 Jan 194325.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 196851.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
19 Jul 196851.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Polinianum
17 Oct 196851.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polinianum
30 Apr 196952.0SucceededBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
17 Aug 198265.3ResignedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
17 Aug 198265.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
4 Jan 198769.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Duluth, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Francis Anderson:
Bishop Paul Francis Anderson (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Duluth

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 18 Sep 2013