Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Pocci

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

Titular Bishop of Ierichus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1912BornRoma
6 Mar 194330.7Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
8 Jul 196149.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
8 Jul 196149.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierichus
30 Jul 196149.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierichus
24 May 197562.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
11 Dec 199179.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Pocci:
Bishop Filippo Pocci (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014