Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John McAreavey

Bishop Emeritus of Dromore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1949 Born
10 Jun 197324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Dromore, Ireland
4 Jun 199950.3AppointedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
19 Sep 199950.6Ordained BishopBishop of Dromore, Ireland
26 Mar 201869.1ResignedBishop of Dromore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John McAreavey (VIAF: 26560793)
Bishop John McAreavey (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Dromore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBanbridge
Ordained BishopSaints Patrick and Colman, Cathedral, Newry, Diocese of Dromore

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dromore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,616
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast