Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NoŽl Treanor

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1950 Born
13 Jun 197625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Clogher, Ireland
22 Feb 200857.1AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
29 Jun 200857.5Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

MicroData Summary for NoŽl Treanor
Bishop NoŽl Treanor (born ) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSilverstream, County Monaghan Tyholland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Down and Connor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2008
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,767

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Aug 2017