Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Fleming

Bishop of Killala, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1948 Born
18 Jun 197224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Limerick, Ireland
19 Feb 200254.0AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
7 Apr 200254.1Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Fleming
Bishop John Fleming (born ) Bishop of Killala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArdpatrick

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Killala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast