Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Joseph-Claude de Bourdeilles

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Soissons


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1720BornSaintes
174625.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 176242.0AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
12 Dec 176242.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
22 Nov 176444.0ResignedBishop of Tulle, France
17 Dec 176444.0AppointedBishop of Soissons, France
180180.1ResignedBishop of Soissons, France
12 Dec 180282.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Soissons, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Joseph-Claude de Bourdeilles:
Bishop Henri-Joseph-Claude de Bourdeilles (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Soissons

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 389, and Page 423

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013