Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Jacques de Montesquiou-Poylobon

Deceased

Bishop of Sarlat, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1710Born
30 May 174737.3SelectedBishop of Sarlat, France
31 Jul 174737.5ConfirmedBishop of Sarlat, France
17 Sep 174737.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sarlat, France
19 Jan 177767.0DiedBishop of Sarlat, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Jacques de Montesquiou-Poylobon (VIAF: 2811725)
Bishop Henri-Jacques de Montesquiou-Poylobon (born , died ) Bishop of Sarlat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalignac

  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast