Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Joseph de Lastic-Lescure

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rieux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1726¹Born
28 Apr 177145.3SelectedBishop of Rieux, France
29 Jul 177145.5ConfirmedBishop of Rieux, France
8 Sep 177145.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rieux, France
6 Nov 180175.8ResignedBishop of Rieux, France
5 Sep 181286.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Rieux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Joseph de Lastic-Lescure
Bishop Pierre-Joseph de Lastic-Lescure (born 1726, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rieux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Martin sous Vigouroux

  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 358
  • ob: CB, 22 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast