Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elléon de Castellane-Mazangues

Deceased

Bishop of Toulon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1746Born
2 Apr 178639.8SelectedBishop of Toulon, France
24 Jul 178640.1ConfirmedBishop of Toulon, France
13 Aug 178640.1Ordained BishopBishop of Toulon, France
29 May 180659.9DiedBishop of Toulon, France

MicroData Summary for Elléon de Castellane-Mazangues
Bishop Elléon de Castellane-Mazangues (born , died ) Bishop of Toulon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMazaugues

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 404

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast