Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltasar Álvarez Restrepo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pereira, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1901Born
20 Dec 193029.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Manizales, Colombia
29 Jun 193130.0Ordained PriestPriest of Manizales, Colombia
7 May 194947.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manizales, Colombia
7 May 194947.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
29 Jun 194948.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
18 Dec 195251.4AppointedBishop of Pereira, Colombia
1 Jul 197675.0RetiredBishop of Pereira, Colombia
26 Mar 198886.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Pereira, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Baltasar Álvarez Restrepo (VIAF: 55444537)
Bishop Baltasar Álvarez Restrepo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pereira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSonsón
Ordained DeaconSeminary Saint-Sulpice, Chapel, Issy-les-Moulineaux, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 48
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast