Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Martínez Madrigal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Garzón-Neiva, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1896Born
18 Sep 192024.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 194246.1AppointedBishop of Garzón, Colombia
16 Aug 194246.3Ordained BishopBishop of Garzón, Colombia
29 Feb 196467.8ResignedBishop of Garzón-Neiva, Colombia
29 Feb 196467.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
27 Sep 197074.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Garzón-Neiva, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Martínez Madrigal
Bishop Gerardo Martínez Madrigal (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Garzón-Neiva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Rosa de Osos

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast