Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Rosso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Piazza Armerina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1912Born
1 Nov 193422.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 197058.5AppointedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
6 Jan 197158.7Ordained BishopBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
8 Jan 198673.7RetiredBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
7 Feb 199481.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Piazza Armerina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Rosso
Bishop Sebastiano Rosso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Piazza Armerina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiaramonte Gulfi

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast