Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond James Boland

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1932BornTipperary, Ireland
16 Jun 195725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
2 Feb 198855.9AppointedBishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA
25 Mar 198856.1Ordained BishopBishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA
22 Jun 199361.3AppointedBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
9 Sep 199361.5InstalledBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
24 May 200573.2ResignedBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
27 Feb 201482.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Raymond James Boland:
Bishop Raymond James Boland (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kansas City-Saint Joseph

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,617
  • d: CB, 27 Feb 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015